In re: Energy Future Holdings Corp. et al.

Defendant: Energy Future Holdings Corp. et al.
Appellant: Elliot International, L.P., UMB Bank, N.A., Elliot Associates, L.P., The Liverpool Limited Partnership, Elliott International, L.P. and Elliott Associates, L.P.
Appellee: Donald L. Evans, Ad Hoc EFH Claimants, EFH Plan Administrator Board, Charles H. Cremens, Billie I. Williamson and Sempra Energy
Case Number: 1:2018cv01225
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 13 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The request to maintain the stay (D.I. [11) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2018. (nms)
October 3, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Joint Status Report served on Various Parties on September 28, 2018, filed by Elliot Associates, L.P., Elliot International, L.P., UMB Bank, N.A.. (Fay, Erin)
October 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aparna Yenamandra for EFH Plan Administrator Board added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
September 28, 2018 11 Joint Status Report, by Elliot Associates, L.P., Elliot International, L.P., UMB Bank, N.A.. (Fay, Erin) Modified on 10/1/2018 (nms).
August 29, 2018 10 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting Joint Stipulation and Order to Stay Appeal and Remove It From Mandatory Mediation Requirement. A Status Report is due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/28/2018. (nms)
August 23, 2018 9 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Elliot Associates, L.P., Elliot International, L.P., The Liverpool Limited Partnership, UMB Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fay, Erin)
August 23, 2018 8 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Erin R. Fay, Esq. regarding Proposed Stipulation And Order To Stay Appeal And Remove It From Mediation Requirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fay, Erin)
August 16, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Esser, filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. McKane. filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aparna Yenamandra, filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc Kieselstein, filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2018. (nms)
August 16, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aparna Yenamandra - filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board. (Madron, Jason)
August 16, 2018 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Esser - filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board. (Madron, Jason)
August 16, 2018 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. McKane - filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board. (Madron, Jason)
August 16, 2018 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc Kieselstein - filed by EFH Plan Administrator Board. (Madron, Jason)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 10, 2018 3 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 4, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office of the District Court. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2018. (fms)
August 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (crb)
August 10, 2018 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (crb)
August 10, 2018 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (crb)
August 10, 2018 1 Featured Case Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 7/26/2018 by Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 14-10979-CSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Elliot International, L.P., Elliot Associates, L.P., UMB Bank, N.A., The Liverpool Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 BK Order on Appeal, #2 BK Transmittal)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Energy Future Holdings Corp. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Future Holdings Corp. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elliot International, L.P.
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elliot Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Liverpool Limited Partnership
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elliott International, L.P.
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elliott Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Erin R. Fay
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donald L. Evans
Represented By: David M. Klauder
Represented By: Cory Preston Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ad Hoc EFH Claimants
Represented By: Garvan F. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFH Plan Administrator Board
Represented By: Jason Michael Madron
Represented By: Mark David Collins
Represented By: Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Represented By: Aparna Yenamandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles H. Cremens
Represented By: Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Billie I. Williamson
Represented By: David M. Klauder
Represented By: Cory Preston Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sempra Energy
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Represented By: Carl Douglas Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?