LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Tucker

Plaintiff: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Defendant: Gregory Tucker
Case Number: 1:2018cv01245
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/18. (sar)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Gregory Tucker. (crb)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Praecipe for Entry of Adverse Order and Affidavit of Constitution and Treaty Enforcement, for the same reasons as set forth in the Court's August 30, 2018 Order #9 . Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/11/18. (sar)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application and complete all questions or pay in full the filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/10/2018. (nmg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 Praecipe for Entry of Adverse Order and Affidavit of Constitution and Treaty Enforcement - filed by Gregory Tucker. (ceg)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER, The request to "undo" the eviction (D.I. #10 ) is treated as a Motion for Reconsideration, and is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2018. (jcs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 Praecipe for Entry of Adverse Order - filed by Gregory Tucker. (ceg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #6 MOTION for Emergency Appeal Writ of Possesion filed by Gregory Tucker. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2018. (ksr, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Cover Letter to #6 MOTION for Emergency Appeal Writ of Possesion by Gregory Tucker. (crb)
August 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental Notice to D.I. #2 Notice of Removal by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ceg)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Appeal Writ of Possesion by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ceg) Modified on 8/30/2018 (jcs).
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Supplemental Affidavit to D.I. #2 Notice of Removal by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ceg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Supplement to D.I. #2 Notice of Removal by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nmg)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N16L-03-181 EMD - filed by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Gregory Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Statement)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Lisa K. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?