Darul Amaanah Academy et al v. City of Wilmington et al
Plaintiff: Darul Amaanah Academy, Tiana Russell, Mia Miller, Bahjeh Rizeq, Iman Ismaa'eel, Tahsiyn Ismaa'eel and Daewanna Word
Defendant: Mayor Michael S. Purzycki, City of Wilmington, Wilmington Department of Parks and Recreation and Kevin F. Kelley, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01292
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SO ORDERED Granting #4 Stipulation and Order Staying Action for All Purposes Pending Final Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/5/2018. (nms)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Staying Action for all Purposes Pending Final Settlement by Darul Amaanah Academy, Iman Ismaa'eel, Tahsiyn Ismaa'eel, Mia Miller, Bahjeh Rizeq, Tiana Russell, Daewanna Word. (Gardner, Cliff)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 5, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: City of Wilmington answer due 10/5/2018; Kevin F. Kelley, Sr answer due 10/5/2018; Michael S. Purzycki answer due 10/5/2018; Wilmington Department of Parks and Recreation answer due 10/5/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME within which Defendants shall move, plead, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 5, 2018 - filed by City of Wilmington. (Russell, Lauren)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2018-0618 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2445271)- filed by Kevin F. Kelley, Sr, City of Wilmington, Michael S. Purzycki, Wilmington Department of Parks and Recreation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darul Amaanah Academy et al v. City of Wilmington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darul Amaanah Academy
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiana Russell
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Miller
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahjeh Rizeq
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iman Ismaa'eel
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahsiyn Ismaa'eel
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daewanna Word
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Michael S. Purzycki
Represented By: Barry M. Willoughby
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilmington
Represented By: Barry M. Willoughby
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Department of Parks and Recreation
Represented By: Barry M. Willoughby
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin F. Kelley, Sr.
Represented By: Barry M. Willoughby
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?