Myers v. Amazon.com.dedc, LLC

Plaintiff: Robin Myers
Defendant: Amazon.com.dedc, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01300
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/17/2018. (dlw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc., Corporate Parent Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. for Amazon.com.dedc, LLC filed by Amazon.com.dedc, LLC. (Victor, Justin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Amazon.com.dedc, LLC.(Victor, Justin) Modified on 10/15/2018 (dlw).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to October 15, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Amazon.com.dedc, LLC answer due 10/15/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/12/2018. (dlw)
September 12, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to October 15, 2018 - filed by Amazon.com.dedc, LLC. (Victor, Justin)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Myers. Amazon.com.dedc, LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Fletcher, William)
August 23, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon.com.dedc, LLC on 8/23/2018. (rwc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Amazon.com.dedc, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 30208.) - filed by Robin Myers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Amazon.com.dedc, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Myers
Represented By: William D. Fletcher, Jr.
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com.dedc, LLC
Represented By: Justin K. Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?