Hensley v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ambra N. Hensley
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv01336
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benderson, Heather)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/15/2018. (nmg)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2018. (ceg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ambra N. Hensley. (nmg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/24/2018) (nmg).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/10/2018. (nmg)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Nancy A. Berryhill (NO IFP, NO FEE PAID) - filed by Ambra Hensley.(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambra N. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?