Intuitive Surgical, Inc. et al v. Auris Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. and Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Defendant: Auris Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01359
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION re #15 Opening Brief in Support, David Styka by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION re #15 Opening Brief in Support, Kathryn Shen by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Opening Brief in Support, Nathan B. Sabri by Auris Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through K)(Farnan, Kelly)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Auris Health, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Auris Health, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan B. Sabri filed by Auris Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/18. (ntl)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan B. Sabri - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael A. Jacobs for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Jacobs - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Jacobs filed by Auris Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/18. (ntl)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ching-Lee Fukuda for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradford J. Badke and Ching-Lee Fukuda filed by Auris Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradford J. Badke and Ching-Lee Fukuda - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Sonal N. Mehta, Laura E. Miller, Vera Ranieri, and Eneda Hoxha for Intuitive Surgical Operations and Intuitive Surgical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stefani E. Shanberg for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bryan Wilson for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Sonal N. Mehta, Laura Miller, Vera Ranieri, and Eneda Hoxha filed by Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc., Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/21/18. (ntl)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Arturo J. Gonzalez for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robin L. Brewer for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sabrina Larson for Auris Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Sonal N. Mehta, Laura Miller, Vera Ranieri, and Eneda Hoxha - filed by Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc., Intuitive Surgical, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arturo J. Gonzlez, Bryan Wilson, Stefani E. Shanberg, Robin L. Brewer and Sabrina Larson filed by Auris Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/18. (ntl)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including October 25, 2018 filed by Auris Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/18. (ntl)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arturo J. Gonzlez, Bryan Wilson, Stefani E. Shanberg, Robin L. Brewer and Sabrina Larson - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including October 25, 2018 - filed by Auris Health, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc., Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.. Auris Health, Inc. served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Keller, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Auris Health, Inc. on 9/4/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Intuitive Surgical, Inc. for Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. filed by Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc., Intuitive Surgical, Inc. (crb)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attachments. (crb)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Auris Health, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2451672.) - filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc., Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 8, #2 Attachment A - H, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intuitive Surgical, Inc. et al v. Auris Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Eneda Hoxha
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Laura E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Eneda Hoxha
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Laura E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auris Health, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Larson
Represented By: Stefani E. Shanberg
Represented By: Arturo J. Gonzalez
Represented By: Ching-Lee Fukuda
Represented By: Robin L. Brewer
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobs
Represented By: Bryan Wilson
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?