Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Defendant: Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01361
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (174 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 5 in 1:18-cv-01361-LPS) STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Windlas Actions (Biogen MA Inc. v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 17-849-LPS; Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 18-1361-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:18-cv-01361-LPS (ntl)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (175 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01361-LPS) Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/18/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:18-cv-01361-LPS (ntl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by Which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Windlas Actions (Biogen MA Inc. v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 17-849-LPS; Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 18-1361-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 31, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,509,376 ;7,320,999. (nmg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 7/24/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2020. (nmg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2451817.) - filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?