Brezial-Williams v. Malone et al

Plaintiff: Lorrelle Brezial-Williams
Defendant: Nyjai Malone and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01392
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Attorney General of the United States on 09/18/2018, filed by Lorrelle Brezial-Williams. (Wasserman, Adam)
September 24, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on U. S. Attorney for the District of Delaware on 09/19/2018, filed by Lorrelle Brezial-Williams. (Wasserman, Adam)
September 19, 2018 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Nyjai Malone on 09/14/2018, filed by Lorrelle Brezial-Williams. (Wasserman, Adam)
September 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Nyjai Malone on 9/10/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
September 7, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed against Nyjai Malone, United States of America - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX030283.) - filed by Lorrelle Brezial-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brezial-Williams v. Malone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyjai Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrelle Brezial-Williams
Represented By: Kenneth M. Roseman
Represented By: Adam F. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?