Cunningham v. Five Star Quality Care, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patrel Cunningham
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01433
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrel Cunningham: For Five Star Quality Care, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Allen, Michele)
September 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 17, 2018 No Summons Issued. (jcs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Five Star Quality Care, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2460445.) - filed by Patrel Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Five Star Quality Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrel Cunningham
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?