Skeans v. Key Commercial Finance LLC et al

Plaintiff: Deborah S. Skeans
Defendant: Equity Pros, LLC, Key Commercial Finance LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC and Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01516
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 23 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Allege Claim with Particularity filed by Equity Pros, LLC, Key Commercial Finance LLC, Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2018. (Kittila, Theodore)
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Allege Claim with Particularity - filed by Equity Pros, LLC, Key Commercial Finance LLC, Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kittila, Theodore)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for all Defendants to Respond to Complaint to November 21, 2018 filed by Equity Pros, LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC, Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC, Key Commercial Finance LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equity Pros, LLC answer due 11/21/2018; Key Commercial Finance LLC answer due 11/21/2018; Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC answer due 11/21/2018; Mobile Agency, LLC answer due 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/18/2018. (fms)
October 18, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for all Defendants to Respond to Complaint to November 21, 2018 - filed by Equity Pros, LLC, Key Commercial Finance LLC, Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah S. Skeans. Equity Pros, LLC served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James Gordon McMillan, III on behalf of All Defendants (McMillan, James)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Allan Kittila on behalf of All Defendants (Kittila, Theodore)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Spencer R. Short filed by Deborah S. Skeans, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Mahoney, Jr. filed by Deborah S. Skeans. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/10/2018. (fms)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Deborah S. Skeans re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Polesky, Joelle)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 Letter to Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Joelle Polesky regarding Status Update. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah S. Skeans. Key Commercial Finance LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 9, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: added defendant Key Commercial Finance LLC to the case (sar)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah S. Skeans. Mobile Agency, LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah S. Skeans. Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and advise the Court on or before October 10, 2018 as to whether or not they have reached an agreed upon schedule for discovery as well as the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/2/2018. (nmf)
October 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2018. Order to issue. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/2/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/1/2018. (nmf)
October 1, 2018 Remark : Exit copies DI#'s 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 & 8 to Duty Judge (CFC). (rwc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Spencer R. Short - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Mahoney, Jr. - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk of Court from Joelle Polesky regarding Complaint and Motions - re #1 Complaint, #5 MEMORANDUM in Support, #7 MEMORANDUM in Support, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Deborah S. Skeans.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/15/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deborah S. Skeans.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/15/2018. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Polesky, Joelle)
October 1, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Key Commercial Finance LLC on 10/1/2018; EquityPros, LLC on 10/1/2018; Key Commercial Finance LLC on 10/1/2018; Mobile Agency, LLC on 10/1/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Key Commercial Finance LLC, EquityPros, LLC, Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC, Mobile Agency, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2471158.) - filed by Deborah S. Skeans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skeans v. Key Commercial Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Pros, LLC
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Theodore Allan Kittila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Commercial Finance LLC
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Theodore Allan Kittila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Agency, LLC
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Theodore Allan Kittila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Commercial Finance Properties, LLC
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Theodore Allan Kittila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah S. Skeans
Represented By: Joelle Eileen Polesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?