In Re: Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.

Appellee: Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.
Appellant: Irene Olin Trust, Jonathan W. Greenlead, Donald A. Bottaro, Virginia Van Gulick, Zoila Thompson, Edna M. Watters, Michael L. Gross, The Bernard & Sylvia Fineberg Living Trust, Florence H. Bottaro, Betty Foster, Barbara K. Greenleaf, Stephen Thompson, C. Spencer Van Gulick, Provident Trust Group, LLC, Kurt Faudel, Lise de La Rochelle, Laurence Popolizio and Ruth E. Scott
Case Number: 1:2018cv01555
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al. (Neiburg, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Pfister for Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 31, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David M. Stern for Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/29/18. (cak)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Donald A. Bottaro, Florence H. Bottaro, Kurt Faudel, Betty Foster, Jonathan W. Greenlead, Barbara K. Greenleaf, Michael L. Gross, Irene Olin Trust, Laurence Popolizio, Provident Trust Group, LLC(fbo Nancy E. Kicherer IRA), Provident Trust Group, LLC(fbo Arnold L. Berman IRA), Ruth E. Scott, The Bernard & Sylvia Fineberg Living Trust, Stephen Thompson, Zoila Thompson, C. Spencer Van Gulick, Virginia Van Gulick, Edna M. Watters, Lise de La Rochelle (Gibson, Jason)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Pfister filed by Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al., #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Stern filed by Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Stern - filed by Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.. (Beach, Sean)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Pfister - filed by Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.. (Beach, Sean)
October 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, October 24, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/10/18. (cak)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
October 10, 2018 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
October 10, 2018 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Opinion and Order entered on 10/5/2018 by Judge Kevin J. Carey in Bankruptcy case number 17-12560 KJC. Fee Status Paid. - filed by Virginia Van Gulick, C. Spencer Van Gulick, Zoila Thompson, Jonathan W. Greenlead, Irene Olin Trust, Lise de La Rochelle, Betty Foster, Edna M. Watters, Florence H. Bottaro, Kurt Faudel, Michael L. Gross, Donald A. Bottaro, Laurence Popolizio, Ruth E. Scott, The Bernard & Sylvia Fineberg Living Trust, Provident Trust Group, LLC(fbo Nancy E. Kicherer IRA), Stephen Thompson, Barbara K. Greenleaf, Provident Trust Group, LLC(fbo Arnold L. Berman IRA). (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Opinion on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.
Represented By: Sean M. Beach
Represented By: Michael Sean Neiburg
Represented By: Ian J. Bambrick
Represented By: Edmon L. Morton
Represented By: David M. Stern
Represented By: Robert J. Pfister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Irene Olin Trust
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jonathan W. Greenlead
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald A. Bottaro
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Virginia Van Gulick
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zoila Thompson
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edna M. Watters
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael L. Gross
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Bernard & Sylvia Fineberg Living Trust
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Florence H. Bottaro
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Betty Foster
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara K. Greenleaf
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: C. Spencer Van Gulick
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Provident Trust Group, LLC
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kurt Faudel
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lise de La Rochelle
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laurence Popolizio
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ruth E. Scott
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?