Magnacharge LLC v. Anker Innovations Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Magnacharge LLC
Defendant: Anker Innovations Ltd., Anker USA, Inc., Fantasia Trading LLC, Anker Technology Corporation and Anker North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01601
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Stipulation Accepting Service and Extending Response Deadline filed by Anker USA, Inc., Fantasia Trading LLC, Anker Innovations Ltd., Anker North America, LLC, Anker Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/18. (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01601-LPS, 1:18-cv-01602-LPS, 1:18-cv-01603-LPS, 1:18-cv-01604-LPS (rjb)
November 8, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nitika Gupta Fiorella on behalf of All Defendants (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
November 8, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren K. Mabey, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Mabey, Warren)
November 7, 2018 10 STIPULATION Accepting Service and extending Response Deadline re #1 Complaint, by Anker Innovations Ltd., Anker North America, LLC, Anker Technology Corporation, Anker USA, Inc., Fantasia Trading LLC. (Mabey, Warren)
October 31, 2018 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Magnacharge LLC as to Anker USA, Inc. and Anker North America, LLC (Devlin, Timothy)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01601-MN, 1:18-cv-01602-MN, 1:18-cv-01603-MN, 1:18-cv-01604-MN (rjb)
October 19, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacharge LLC. Anker USA, Inc. served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 19, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacharge LLC. Anker North America, LLC served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 19, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacharge LLC. Fantasia Trading LLC served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 19, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacharge LLC. Anker Technology Corporation served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Equitable IP Corporation for Magnacharge LLC filed by Magnacharge LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Anker Innovations Ltd. on 10/17/2018; Anker North America, LLC on 10/17/2018; Anker Technology Corporation on 10/17/2018; Anker USA, Inc. on 10/17/2018; Fantasia Trading LLC on 10/17/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
October 17, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,417,402 B2. (crb)
October 17, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
October 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Ltd., Anker North America, LLC, Anker Technology Corporation, Anker USA, Inc., Fantasia Trading LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2482819.) - filed by Magnacharge LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnacharge LLC v. Anker Innovations Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Innovations Ltd.
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasia Trading LLC
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Technology Corporation
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnacharge LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?