Campbell v. Navient Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Georkeshia Denise Campbell
Defendant: United States Department of Education and Navient Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01625
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Tracey Sasser re #7 MOTION to Dismiss, by United States Department of Education. (Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 12/6/2018 (nms).
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Cristin O'Keefe re #7 MOTION to Dismiss, by United States Department of Education. (Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 12/6/2018 (nms).
December 5, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The declarations and exhibits attached to the brief filed at D.I. 8 have been removed from the docket. Declarations and briefs should not be coupled together at one docket item entry. Counsel will refile the declarations at separate docket item entries. (nms)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by United States Department of Education.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 12/5/2018 (nms).
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction - filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 12/5/2018 (nms).
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUBPOENA directed to Clerk of Court Wilkes Barre Superior Court, filed by Georkeshia Denise Campbell (ceg) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, Granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: United States Department of Education answer due 12/4/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2018. (nms)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 23, 2018 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (ceg)
October 22, 2018 Remark : Exit copies of Motion (DI 3) and related documents to Duty Judge (RGA) for review. (rwc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Eileen Polesky on behalf of Navient Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Polesky, Joelle)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to the Clerk John Cerino, from AUSA, Jesse S. Wenger, regarding case assignment. (Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 10/24/2018 (nms).
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint - filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wenger, Jesse) Modified on 10/24/2018 (nms).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from JP COURT NO.13, Case Number 556-45-0639 DMCS - filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Navient Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Jesse S. Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Corporation
Represented By: Jesse S. Wenger
Represented By: Joelle Eileen Polesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georkeshia Denise Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?