Mentone Solutions LLC. v. NETGEAR, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mentone Solutions LLC.
Defendant: NETGEAR, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01714
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 Stipulation (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: NETGEAR, Inc. answer due 1/21/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/17/2018. (dlw)
December 16, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by NETGEAR, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 Stipulation (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: NETGEAR, Inc. answer due 12/21/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/20/2018. (dlw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by NETGEAR, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alan Pearson on behalf of All Defendants (Pearson, Matthew)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01713-MN, 1:18-cv-01714-MN (rjb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mentone Solutions LLC.. NETGEAR, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mentone Solutions LLC.. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to NETGEAR, Inc. on 10/31/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,952,413 B2. (rwc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against NETGEAR, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2493758.) - filed by Mentone Solutions LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mentone Solutions LLC. v. NETGEAR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NETGEAR, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Alan Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mentone Solutions LLC.
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?