Rate Integration, Inc. v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Rate Integration, Inc.
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01735
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Rate Integration, Inc. by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klayman, Barry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Evolving Systems, Inc. for Rate Integration, Inc. filed by Rate Integration, Inc.. (Buck, Kate)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Indemnity Company filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Klayman, Barry)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2018. (dlw)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 12/17/2018 both Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a Corporation Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/10/2018. (dlw)
December 9, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Indemnity Company.(Klayman, Barry)
December 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph Vila for Rate Integration, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sherilyn Pastor for Rate Integration, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
November 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Valerie D. Rojas for Scottsdale Indemnity Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R. Davisson for Scottsdale Indemnity Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherilyn Pastor and Joseph Vila of McCarter & English LLP filed by Rate Integration, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2018. (dlw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherilyn Pastor and Joseph Vila of McCarter & English LLP - filed by Rate Integration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel of Sherilyn Pastor, Esq., #2 Certification by Counsel of Joseph Vila, Esq.)(Buck, Kate)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Davisson filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/13/2018. (dlw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Davisson - filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Klayman, Barry)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Valerie D. Rojas filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/9/2018. (dlw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Valerie D. Rojas - filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Klayman, Barry)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to 12/10/2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Scottsdale Indemnity Company answer due 12/10/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2018. (dlw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to 12/10/2018 - filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Klayman, Barry)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct., Case Number N18C-09-223 EMD (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2496152)- filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rate Integration, Inc. v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rate Integration, Inc.
Represented By: Sherilyn Pastor
Represented By: Kate Roggio Buck
Represented By: Joseph Vila
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry M. Klayman
Represented By: Valerie D. Rojas
Represented By: Michael R. Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?