Johnson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Lavise Mae Johnson
Defendant: Richard M. Ciaramello, Jr. and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv01753
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Lavise Mae Johnson. (nmg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Benderson, Heather)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to D.I. #2 Complaint (Pro Se), filed by Lavise Mae Johnson. (ceg)
November 19, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Accidently docketed letter in the wrong case. I removed from the docket. (sar)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Party Richard M. Ciaramello, Jr terminated.. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/19/18. (sar)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/15/2018. (lak)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se against Nancy A. Berryhill, Richard M. Ciaramello, Jr - filed by Lavise Mae Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Lavise Mae Johnson. (rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Ciaramello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavise Mae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?