Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01779
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/4/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01689-CFC et al.(nmf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding coordinated discovery and Markman proceedings, and to request a scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before January 2, 2019, counsel for plaintiffs shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/2/2019.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01689-CFC et al.(nmf)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 11, 2019 filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/11/2018. (fms)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 11, 2019 - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Phillips, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Mailing on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01757-CFC, 1:18-cv-01758-CFC, 1:18-cv-01762-CFC through 1:18-cv-01765-CFC, 1:18-cv-01779-CFC, 1:18-cv-01783-CFC, and 1:18-cv-01785-CFC through 1:18-cv-01789-CFC (rjb)
November 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. on 11/13/2018; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. on 11/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate C. H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (lak)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,713,938 B2 ;9,949,998 B2. (lak)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 9/29/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attachments.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/1/2022. (lak)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2501821.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?