Genzyme Corp. et al v. Apotex Corp. et al
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan and Genzyme Corp.
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01795
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/31/2019 at 04:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01795-CFC, 1:18-cv-01796-CFC, 1:18-cv-01837-CFC, 1:18-cv-01838-CFC, 1:18-cv-01839-CFC(nmf)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Solander, Michael E. Furrow, Daniel J. Minion, Damien N. Dombrowski and Katherine E. Adams of Venable LLP filed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Genzyme Corp. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2019. (fms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Solander, Michael E. Furrow, Daniel J. Minion, Damien N. Dombrowski and Katherine E. Adams of Venable LLP - filed by Genzyme Corp., The Regents of the University of Michigan. (Fahnestock, Derek)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding proposed joint scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before December 28, 2018, counsel for plaintiffs shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/28/2018.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01795-CFC, 1:18-cv-01796-CFC, 1:18-cv-01837-CFC, 1:18-cv-01838-CFC, 1:18-cv-01839-CFC(nmf)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01795-CFC, 1:18-cv-01796-CFC (rjb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Genzyme Corp.: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Fahnestock, Derek)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing (as to service on Apotex Inc.) by Genzyme Corp., The Regents of the University of Michigan. (Fahnestock, Derek)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Genzyme Corp.. Apotex Corp. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Fahnestock, Derek)
November 15, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apotex Corp. on 11/15/2018; Apotex Inc. on 11/15/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aventis Inc., Corporate Parent Sanofi, Corporate Parent Sanofi-Aventis Amrique du Nord for Genzyme Corp. filed by Genzyme Corp.. (sar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,196,205 B2. (sar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: October 3, 2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: June 26, 2026.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/19/2022. (sar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2504085.) - filed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Genzyme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genzyme Corp. et al v. Apotex Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genzyme Corp.
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?