McCove v. The Board of Education of the Polytech School District

Plaintiff: Tajah R. McCove
Defendant: The Board of Education of the Polytech School District
Case Number: 1:2018cv01809
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/15/2019, at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2019. (nms)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Board of Education of the Polytech School District.(McMackin, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tajah R. McCove: For The Board of Education of the Polytech School District waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (LaRosa, John)
November 28, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The waiver filed at D.I. 3 has been removed from the docket as it indicated the Plaintiff was served and set an answering due date for the Plaintiff. Counsel shall refile this document and reflect that the defendant was served. (nms)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 16, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against The Board of Education of the Polytech School District - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2505580.) - filed by Tajah R. McCove. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCove v. The Board of Education of the Polytech School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajah R. McCove
Represented By: John M. LaRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Education of the Polytech School District
Represented By: James H. McMackin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?