XMTT, Inc. v. Intel Corporation

Plaintiff: XMTT, Inc.
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01810
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to January 21, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 1/21/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2018. (nms)
December 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to January 21, 2019 - filed by Intel Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XMTT, Inc.. Intel Corporation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Farnan, Brian)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Intel Corporation on 11/16/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,145,879 B2 ;US 7,707,388 B2. (sar)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Intel Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2505609.) - filed by XMTT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XMTT, Inc. v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XMTT, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?