Silber et al v. Airbnb, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alon Madiel, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Gulie Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Yair Spolter, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Susan Lynn Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Tsofiya Jacob, Moriyah Shapiro, Daniel Jacob, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moshe Gordon, Lewis Weinger, Jonathan Shapiro, Eric Charles Marx and David Tesler
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01884
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamie S. Gorelick, David W. Bowker, Benjamin Chapin, and Leon T. Kenworthy, filed by Airbnb, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2019. (nms)
January 8, 2019 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamie S. Gorelick, David W. Bowker, Benjamin Chapin, and Leon T. Kenworthy - filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Tolchin for Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, and Lewis Weinger added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 21, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Airbnb, Inc.- filed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter, and David Tesler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eagle, David) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION Order for Extension (*Reset Deadlines: Airbnb, Inc. answer due 1/29/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/26/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/21/2018. (nms)
December 20, 2018 5 STIPULATION Order for Extension - filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Poff, Adam) Modified on 12/20/2018 (nms).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Tolchin, filed by Danielle Madiel, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Moshe Gordon, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Alon Madiel, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Howard Rabin, Gulie Madiel, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Samuel Silber. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2018. (nms)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 30, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter. Airbnb, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Brennecke, Sean)
November 30, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Airbnb, Inc. on 11/30/2018. (rwc)
November 29, 2018 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Tolchin - filed by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber. (Brennecke, Sean)
November 28, 2018 No Summons Issued. (ddp)
November 28, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
November 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Airbnb, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2513128.) - filed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silber et al v. Airbnb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alon Madiel
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Silber
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Rabin
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inbal Nazdare Levy
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulie Madiel
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Madiel
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yair Spolter
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Eddy Strulovits
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Marx
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Schwartz
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsofiya Jacob
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moriyah Shapiro
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jacob
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Lynn Strulovits
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Gordon
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Weinger
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Charles Marx
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tesler
Represented By: David S. Eagle
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Robert J. Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?