Purohit v. Legend Pictures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kaylan Purohit and Clement Gore
Defendant: Universal Studios LLC, Legend Pictures, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01907
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaylan Purohit. Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaylan Purohit. Universal Studios LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaylan Purohit. Legend Pictures, LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 3, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Legend Pictures, LLC on 12/3/2018; Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC on 12/3/2018; Universal Studios LLC on 12/3/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)TX0008463196;. (nmg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Legend Pictures, LLC, Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC, Universal Studios LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2515248.) - filed by Kaylan Purohit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purohit v. Legend Pictures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylan Purohit
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: James M Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clement Gore
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: James M Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Pictures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?