Univar, Inc. v. Geisenberger et al

Plaintiff: Univar, Inc.
Defendant: Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger and Brenda R. Mayrack
Case Number: 1:2018cv01909
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) to February 8, 2019 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - Answering Brief due 2/8/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/16/2019. (dlw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) to February 8, 2019 - filed by Univar, Inc.. (White, David)
January 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John D. Taliaferro, Tiffany R. Moseley, and Steven S. Rosenthal for Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, and Brenda R. Mayrack added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiffany R. Moseley, #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John David Taliaferro, #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven S. Rosenthal filed by Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack, Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2019. (dlw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Brenda R. Mayrack, #4 Certificate of Service)(Cross, Caroline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER To dismiss for lack of jurisdiction re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack. (Cross, Caroline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cross, Caroline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John David Taliaferro - filed by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Cross, Caroline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven S. Rosenthal - filed by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Cross, Caroline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiffany R. Moseley - filed by Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cross, Caroline)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint to January 11, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan answer due 1/11/2019; Richard J. Geisenberger answer due 1/11/2019; Brenda R. Mayrack answer due 1/11/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/14/2018. (dlw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to January 11, 2019 - filed by Univar, Inc. (White, David) Modified on 12/14/2018 (dlw).
December 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James G. Ryan, Jameel S. Turner for Univar, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James G. Ryan and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jameel S. Turner filed by Univar, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/2018. (dlw)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Univar, Inc.. (Rifino, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/4/2018 as to Matthew Denn, Attorney General of the State of Delaware on behalf of All Defendants. (Rifino, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Univar, Inc.. Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Rifino, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Univar, Inc.. Brenda R. Mayrack served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Rifino, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Univar, Inc.. Richard J. Geisenberger served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Rifino, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan on 12/4/2018; Richard J. Geisenberger on 12/4/2018; Brenda R. Mayrack on 12/4/2018. (lak)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jameel S. Turner - filed by Univar, Inc.. (White, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James G. Ryan - filed by Univar, Inc.. (White, David)
December 3, 2018 No Summons Issued. (sar)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan, Richard J. Geisenberger, Brenda R. Mayrack - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2515860.) - filed by Univar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Verification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Univar, Inc. v. Geisenberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M. (Whitaker) Sullivan
Represented By: Caroline Lee Cross
Represented By: Steven S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Tiffany R. Moseley
Represented By: John D. Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Geisenberger
Represented By: Caroline Lee Cross
Represented By: Steven S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Tiffany R. Moseley
Represented By: John D. Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda R. Mayrack
Represented By: Caroline Lee Cross
Represented By: Steven S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Tiffany R. Moseley
Represented By: John D. Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Univar, Inc.
Represented By: David A. White
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Rifino
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Jameel S. Turner
Represented By: James G. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?