Fortis Advisors LLC v. Wise

Plaintiff: Fortis Advisors LLC
Defendant: Helene N. Wise
Case Number: 1:2018cv01936
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, dated 12/18/2018, from the Clerk of Court, enclosing certified copy of remand order (D.I #4 ). (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SO ORDERED Granting #3 Stipulation and Order Remanding This Action to the Court of Chancery for the State of Delaware (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2018. (nms)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Remanding This Action To The Court Of Chancery For The State Of Delaware, by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Townsend, Ethan) Modified on 12/17/2018 (nms).
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Ct, Case Number 2018-0829-TMR (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2518995)- filed by Helene N. Wise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortis Advisors LLC v. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helene N. Wise
Represented By: William E. Chipman, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Damon Brown
Represented By: Gregory Erich Stuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortis Advisors LLC
Represented By: Ethan Haller Townsend
Represented By: Ashley R. Altschuler
Represented By: Harrison S. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?