Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Intel Corporation

Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01977
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 1, 2019 filed by Intel Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/28/2018. (fms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 1, 2019 - filed by Intel Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. Intel Corporation served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
December 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Intel Corporation on 12/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,335,392; 8,442,118; 8,526,502. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,929,609; 7,982,799; 7,995,793; 8,155,459. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,050,114; 8,385,426; 6,760,376; 6,782,054. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Intel Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2524388.) - filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?