Karpchuk v. Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Karpchuk
Defendant: Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01979
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Karpchuk. Main Street Business Funding, LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (ceg)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Main Street Business Funding, LLC on 12/26/2018. (ceg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Main Street Business Funding, LLC- filed by Jennifer Karpchuk.(ceg)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01978-LPS, 1:18-cv-01979-LPS (rjb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Main Street Business Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX030835.) - filed by Jennifer Karpchuk. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
December 13, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karpchuk v. Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Karpchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?