Devon Park Associates, L.P. et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Devon Park Bioventures, L.P. and Devon Park Associates, L.P.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02011
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 Stipulation and Order Regarding Service and Filings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/15/19. (ntl)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Devon Park Associates, L.P., Devon Park Bioventures, L.P.. (Yoch, James)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Service and Filings by Devon Park Associates, L.P., Devon Park Bioventures, L.P.. (Yoch, James)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd. for Federal Insurance Company filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N18C-11-210 AML CCLD (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2528562)- filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devon Park Associates, L.P. et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Park Bioventures, L.P.
Represented By: William D. Johnston
Represented By: James M. Yoch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Park Associates, L.P.
Represented By: William D. Johnston
Represented By: James M. Yoch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?