Rodriguez-Aguilar v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez-Aguilar
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv02038
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sar)
January 7, 2019 Remark : Issued summons forms were never picked up from Clerk's Office - Mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (rwc)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 27, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced Plaintiff's Complaint with complete pdf document. (rwc)
December 27, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Delaware U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against United States of America - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2530800.) - filed by Jesus Rodriguez-Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (rwc). Modified on 12/27/2018 (rwc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Aguilar v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez-Aguilar
Represented By: Joel Harry Fredricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?