Cloud9 Technologies LLC v. IPC Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cloud9 Technologies LLC
Defendant: IPC Systems, Inc. and IPC Network Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02042
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SO ORDERED, re (13 in 1:18-cv-02042-CFC) STIPULATION TO STAY, (215 in 1:16-cv-00443-CFC) STIPULATION TO STAY, CASES STAYED. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00443-CFC, 1:18-cv-02042-CFC(nmf)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings by IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Redacted Version of Complaint to February 15, 2019 filed by IPC Systems, Inc., IPC Network Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/24/2019. (fms)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Redacted Version of Complaint to February 15, 2019 - filed by IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a redacted version of Plaintiff's Complaint to January 25, 2019 filed by IPC Systems, Inc., IPC Network Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/18/2019. (fms)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a redacted version of Plaintiff's Complaint to January 25, 2019 - filed by IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 28, 2019 filed by IPC Systems, Inc., IPC Network Services, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: IPC Network Services, Inc. answer due 2/28/2019; IPC Systems, Inc. answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/16/2019. (fms)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 28, 2019 - filed by IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud9 Technologies LLC. IPC Network Services, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud9 Technologies LLC. IPC Systems, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #5 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Redacted Version of Complaint to January 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/2/2019. (nmf)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/2/2019. (nmf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Redacted Version of Complaint to January 21, 2019 - filed by IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to IPC Network Services, Inc. on 12/26/2018; IPC Systems, Inc. on 12/26/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. for Cloud9 Technologies LLC filed by Cloud9 Technologies LLC. (ceg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against IPC Network Services, Inc., IPC Systems, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2530965.) - filed by Cloud9 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Exhibits - filed by Cloud9 Technologies LLC. (ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloud9 Technologies LLC v. IPC Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloud9 Technologies LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPC Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPC Network Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?