Biogen International GmbH v. Banner Life Sciences LLC
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Defendant: Banner Life Sciences LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02054
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #15 Answering Brief in Opposition (Declaration of Jeanette M. Roorda), by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-24)(Balick, Steven)
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Biogen International GmbH.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/1/2019. (Balick, Steven)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Cunning, II and Yifang Zhao filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/21/19. (ntl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Cunning, II and Yifang Zhao - filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. (Keller, Karen)
February 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Li Feng,Jeanette M. Roorda,James B. Monroe,Paul W. Browning,Andrew E. Renison for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John W. Bateman,Elizabeth M. Crompton,C. Kyle Musgrove for Banner Life Sciences LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/19. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Paul W. Browning, Li Feng, Andrew E. Renison, and Jeanette M. Roorda filed by Biogen International GmbH, #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Kyle Musgrove, John W. Bateman, and Elizabeth M. Crompton filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/8/19. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by which Plaintiff's Answering Brief is due in Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (D.I. 9), by Biogen International GmbH. (Balick, Steven)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Kyle Musgrove, John W. Bateman, and Elizabeth M. Crompton - filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. (Keller, Karen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Paul W. Browning, Li Feng, Andrew E. Renison, and Jeanette M. Roorda - filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Keller, Karen)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayo, Andrew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Royal DSM N.V. for Banner Life Sciences LLC filed by Banner Life Sciences LLC. (Keller, Karen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Biogen International GmbH by Banner Life Sciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Keller, Karen)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biogen Inc., Corporate Parent Biogen MA Inc., Corporate Parent Biogen Luxembourg Holding Sarl, Corporate Parent Biogen Switzerland Holdings GmbH for Biogen International GmbH filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Balick, Steven)
December 27, 2018 No Summons Issued. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,619,001. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/20/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/20/2020.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2020. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Banner Life Sciences LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2532697.) - filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Banner Life Sciences LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Life Sciences LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Bateman
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Li Feng
Represented By: Paul W. Browning
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: Jeanette M. Roorda
Represented By: Andrew E. Renison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?