Mullane v. Midland Mortgage
Plaintiff: Catherine Mullane
Defendant: Midland Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Remark: No response to e-mail sent to Pro-Se Plaintiff regarding completion of Electronic Filing Registration form. Mailed form to Plaintiff with copy of Order (D.I. #78 ). (rwc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SO ORDERED Granting #79 Request for extension to respond to the Amended Complaint on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2019. (nms)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SO ORDERED, Granting #77 MOTION for Extension of Time (*Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2019. (nms)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SO ORDERED, Granting #78 MOTION for Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2019. (nms)
February 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 80 has been removed from the docket. The pdf for the certificate of service file at that entry has now replaced the certificate of service at D.I. #79 . (nms)
February 14, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE to #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Midland Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giordano, Phillip) Modified on 2/15/2019 (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/15/2019) (nms).
February 13, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Electronic Filing - filed by Catherine Mullane. (lak) Modified on 2/13/2019 (nms).
February 13, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Amended Complaint - filed by Catherine Mullane. (lak)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (D.I. #75 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2019. (nms)
January 29, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Midland Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement, #3 Certificate of Service)(Giordano, Phillip) Modified on 1/29/2019 (nms).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Polansky, filed by Midland Mortgage. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2019. (nms)
January 25, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Polansky - filed by Midland Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Giordano, Phillip) Modified on 1/28/2019 (nms).
January 25, 2019 Filing 73 STATEMENT Identifying Pending Matters, by Midland Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giordano, Phillip) Modified on 1/28/2019 (nms).
January 25, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Anthony Giordano on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giordano, Phillip) Modified on 1/28/2019 (nms).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renew. (D.I. #23 ). Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. (D.I. #57 ). Plaintiff shall submit to the Court her amended complaint for the Court's review on or before February 8, 2019. Plaintiff's motion for joinder is DISMISSED as moot. (D.I. #56 ). The Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. (D.I. #60 ). Plaintiff's request for waiver of bond under Connecticut law is DISMISSED as moot. (D.I. #61 ). (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2019. (nms)
January 15, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Midland Mortgage: Entry of appearance of attorney David Shane Gunter. Attorney Oscar L. Suarez terminated. (Gunter, David)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 69 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/4/2019. (lak)
January 4, 2019 Filing 68 Record of case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number in Other District: 3:17-cv-01209. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
December 21, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware for the reasons in the attached memorandum. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/21/2018. (Mattessich, William) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying as moot #64 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/20/2018. (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Discovery status teleconference held on 12/19/2018. The Court will enter an order transferring this case to the District of Delaware. Total Time: 54 minutes. (Court Reporter F. Velez, ECRO.) (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 64 First MOTION to Continue Pre-trial Teleconference by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition re #57 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Midland Mortgage. (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition re #60 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Midland Mortgage. (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 61 First MOTION for Bond Waiver by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 60 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Catherine Mullane.Responses due by 12/21/2018 (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The teleconference originally scheduled for 11/28/2018 is hereby rescheduled for 12/19/2018 at 3:00pm due to Plaintiff's failure to attend. Plaintiff did not respond to emails or phone calls from the Court or Defendant's counsel. If Plaintiff fails to attend the rescheduled teleconference, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/28/2018. (Mattessich, William) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 57 First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Catherine Mullane.Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 doc 2 amended complaint)(Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Joinder by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 9/25/2018. Total Time: 3 hours and 10 minutes. Case not settled. (Landsman, Halle) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE: The text of docket entry #52 should say 9/25/18. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 7/25/18. (Reitz, Katharine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 9/25/18 at 1:00 pm. Please see attached order. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 7/25/18. (Reitz, Katharine) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit the date. (Blue, A.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 7/25/2018. Total Time: 2 hours and 10 minutes. Case not settled. The parties have requested a day 2 settlement conference, which shall be scheduled for 9/25/18 at 1:00 pm. (Reitz, Katharine) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit the date. (Blue, A.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #49 plaintiff's Motion to participate via phone in light of the fact that the plaintiff will be appearing via video. The plaintiff will receive instructions regarding how to participate via video-conference. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 7/24/18. (Reitz, Katharine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION Misc by Catherine Mullane.Responses due by 8/13/2018 (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Defendant's representative to attend the settlement conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 7/19/18. (Reitz, Katharine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION Defendant's Request to Participate Via Telephone re: July 25, 2018 Settlement Conference by Midland Mortgage.Responses due by 8/9/2018 (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven B. Ryan terminated. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/19/18. (Mattessich, William). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Steven B. Ryan to Withdraw as Attorney by Midland Mortgage. (Ryan, Steven) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 44 First OBJECTION To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 7/25/18 at 1:00 pm. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 5/10/18. (Reitz, Katharine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Objection to the Motion to Dismiss is due May 21, 2018. Neither the present motion nor Plaintiff's initial Motion for Extension #27 state good cause for an extension of time under Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b), however, due to Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court has granted both motions. In the future, Plaintiff is directed to review the Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure and comply with the standards set forth therein. No further extensions shall be granted absent good cause shown. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/7/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
May 5, 2018 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2018 Complete Motion to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/20/2018. (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The parties are to jointly contact Judge Richardson's Chambers to schedule an early settlement conference, per their request in their Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/20/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 11/28/2018 at 4:30pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 3/1/2019. Dispositive motions are due by 4/30/2019. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum (JTM) is due by 5/7/2019, and a bench trial will take place during the month of June 2019 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 1/7/2020, and a bench trial will take place during the month of February 2020 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers Practices [DKT 5], including the deadlines and format of filings, when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied any motions in limine. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/20/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ryan, Steven) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/6/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 MOTION to Dismiss; responses now due by 5/6/2018. #28 Motion for Extension of Time is granted; the 26(F) Report is now due 04/19/2018. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/06/2018. (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 32 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Midland Mortgage re #30 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Defendant's Statement (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2018 to confer with opposing party and compile and file joint report 26 Notice,,,, by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss until May 6, 2018 by Catherine Mullane. (Mullane, Catherine) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Catherine Mullane. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Hernandez, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2018: #2 Envelope) (Hernandez, T.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 26 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before 04/05/2018: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 03/22/2018.(Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar L. Suarez on behalf of Midland Mortgage (Suarez, Oscar) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Midland Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ryan, Steven) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Midland Mortgage.Responses due by 3/27/2018 (Ryan, Steven) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven B. Ryan on behalf of Midland Mortgage (Ryan, Steven) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Mullane. (Fanelle, Nicholas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/06/2018. (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to participate in e-filing. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint until March 6, 2018. No further extensions shall be granted absent good cause shown under Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/5/2018. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/6/2018 To Plead by Midland Mortgage. (Fahey, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Mortgage identifying Corporate Parent Midland Financial Corporation for Midland Mortgage. (Fahey, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Fahey on behalf of Midland Mortgage (Fahey, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
January 31, 2018 USM 285 form together with #9 Summons, #1 Complaint, and 7 Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Catherine Mullane. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 13 Consent to Electronic Notice by Catherine Mullane. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Catherine Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 envelope) (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Clerk's Office mailed the Plaintiff forms and instructions to aid in serving the Defendant on August 29, 2017. Plaintiff has not returned the required documentation to the Clerk's Office, and the 90-day period to serve the Defendant has expired. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) (setting time limit for service). Plaintiff is ordered to return the required documentation to the Clerk's Office by January 26, 2018. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/29/2017. (Hudson, C) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 10 USM 285 forms together with Summons/Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 , #4 , #5 , 7 , #8 , #9 and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Midland Mortgage* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Pro Se *Catherine Mullane* *P.O. Box 777* *Ridgefield, CT 06877-0777*. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Catherine Mullane, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Catherine Mullane, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Request to Issue Summons, #4 Standing Protective Order, and 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2017.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. The plaintiff has fully completed the required information. She asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that the plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, the plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court has also reviewed the Complaint (Doc. #1) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and finds the claim is sufficient to proceed to service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 8/25/17. (Klebes, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for ruling on #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/20/2017. (Shafer, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/20/2017.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/20/2017.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/20/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2017. Discovery due by 1/19/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2018. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2017.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Midland Mortgage. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Catherine Mullane. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Mortgage, filed by Catherine Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullane v. Midland Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Mortgage
Represented By: David Shane Gunter
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?