Bank of America, N.A. v. Ackie El

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Ahmard Kwasi Klement Ackie El and Ahmard Ackie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Prothonotary, DE Superior Court from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 2/28/2019 regarding certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent. (nmg)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, The matter is summarily REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a certified copy of the remand Order to the State Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/28/2019. (nmg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Michael Pak. (sar)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Defendant shall pay the $400 filing fee in full on or before January 28, 2019. Defendant is placed on notice that the matter will be summarily remanded to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County should he fail to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/14/2019. (lak)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18L-03-00122 DCS - filed by Ahmard Kwasi Klement Ackie El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ahmard Kwasi Klement Ackie El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Ackie El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmard Kwasi Klement Ackie El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmard Ackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Janet Z. Charlton
Represented By: Chase N. Miller
Represented By: Michael Pak
Represented By: Monica Loftin Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?