Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Geoforce, Inc.

Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Defendant: Geoforce, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 29, 2019 filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/28/19. (ntl)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 29, 2019 - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 28, 2019 filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/19. (ntl)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 28, 2019 - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark (related to 1:18-cv-01801-LPS). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Geoforce, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Geoforce, Inc. on 1/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,219,978 B2 ;US 9,781,558 B2. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Geoforce, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2538003.) - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Geoforce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoforce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?