Brown et al v. Chase Bank (USA), National Association et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Brown and Tyler Brown
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Chase Bank (USA), National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 25, 2019 filed by Chase Bank (USA), National Association. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/19. (ntl)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 25, 2019 - filed by Chase Bank (USA), National Association. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Stephanie Brown, Tyler Brown (Garibian, Antranig)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 8, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/19. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 8, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 22, 2019 filed by Chase Bank (USA), National Association. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/19. (ntl)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 22, 2019 - filed by Chase Bank (USA), National Association. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Brown, Stephanie Brown. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Brown, Stephanie Brown. Chase Bank (USA), National Association served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chase Bank (USA), National Association on 1/10/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/10/2019 (*summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (ceg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Chase Bank (USA), National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2541029.) - filed by Tyler Brown, Stephanie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Chase Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank (USA), National Association
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Brown
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Brown
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?