Covance Laboratories Inc. v. ChromaDex, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Covance Laboratories Inc.
Defendant: ChromaDex, Inc. and ChromaDex Analytics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00065
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
0 Judge: Richard G Andrews
1 Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/8/2019. (lih)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to March 14, 2019 - filed by Covance Laboratories Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial Disclosures filed by ChromaDex Analytics, Inc., ChromaDex, Inc..(Mullin, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Covance's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Covance Laboratories Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 28, 2019 Reset Hearings: A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews and not Judge Fallon as previously indicated in the text of D.I. #15 . The entry of the scheduling order has been modified to reflect the appropriate Judge. (lih)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Status Report due by 9/10/2019. A Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 5/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 5/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 5/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 5/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2019. (lih) Modified on 2/28/2019 (lih).
February 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Teleconference held on 2/25/2019. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting letter request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the in-person rule 16 conference set in this matter for 2/25/2019 at 10:00 A.M. is converted into a teleconference. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/22/2019. (lih)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Covance Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 2/21/2019 (lih). Modified on 2/21/2019 (nms).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joe Tuffaha and Prashanth Chennakesavan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/11/2019. (lih)
February 7, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #13 has been replace with an amended version. The caption on the filing has been updated, as has the signature line on the proposed order. (nms)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joe Tuffaha and Prashanth Chennakesavan - filed by ChromaDex Analytics, Inc., ChromaDex, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Mullin, Elizabeth) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/7/2019) (nms).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Oral Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 2/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the conference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 2/20/2019. The Court's form of scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/5/2019. (lih)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER: The case is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2019. (nms)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent ChromaDex Corporation for ChromaDex, Inc. filed by ChromaDex, Inc.. (Mullin, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent ChromaDex, Inc., Corporate Parent ChromaDex Corporation for ChromaDex Analytics, Inc. filed by ChromaDex Analytics, Inc.. (Mullin, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The disclosure statements attached to the answer at D.I. #9 have been removed from that entry. Disclosure statements are not to be coupled with other filings, but filed at its own docket item entry. Counsel will refile the statements accordingly. (nms)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Demand for Jury Trial, by ChromaDex Analytics, Inc., ChromaDex, Inc.. Mullin, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/4/2019 (nms).
February 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Malavika Rao,Robert I. Steiner for Covance Laboratories Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert I. Steiner and Malavika Rao, filed by Covance Laboratories Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2019. (nms)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons in a Civil Action served on Defendants ChromaDex, Inc. and ChromaDex Analytics, Inc. on January 14, 2019, filed by Covance Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/17/2019 (nms).
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert I. Steiner and Malavika Rao - filed by Covance Laboratories Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
January 11, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION for leave to file Exhibit A to Complaint under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/10/2019. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ChromaDex Analytics, Inc. on 1/10/2019; ChromaDex, Inc. on 1/10/2019. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings for Covance Laboratories Inc. filed by Covance Laboratories Inc. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A to D.I. #2 Complaint by Covance Laboratories Inc. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ChromaDex Analytics, Inc. and ChromaDex, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031081.) - filed by Covance Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to file Exhibit A to Complaint under Seal - filed by Covance Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covance Laboratories Inc. v. ChromaDex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covance Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Malavika Rao
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChromaDex, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChromaDex Analytics, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?