Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. MediaTek Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and ATI Technologies ULC
Defendant: MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., ATI Technologies ULC. MediaTek USA Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Metzler, Sara)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to MediaTek Inc. on 3/6/2019; MediaTek USA Inc. on 3/6/2019. (2 summons each) (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Case Compendium in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Related ITC Proceedings filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc..(Egan, Brian)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Related ITC Proceedings filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Egan, Brian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Related ITC Proceedings filed by ATI Technologies ULC, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cottrell, Frederick)
February 13, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MediaTek Inc., Other Affiliate MediaTek Investment Singapore Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Gaintech Co., Other Affiliate MTK Wireless Limited (UK) for MediaTek USA Inc.; Corporate Parent no parent corporation for MediaTek Inc. filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Related ITC Proceedings filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2019. (Egan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Related ITC Proceedings - filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan - filed by MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marguerite McConihe for ATI Technologies ULC and Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William Meunier, Michael T. Renaud, Michael J. McNamara, James M. Wodarski, and Adam S. Rizk for ATI Technologies ULC and Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Renaud, James M. Wodarski, Michael J. McNamara, William A.Meunier, Adam S. Rizk and Marguerite McConihe filed by ATI Technologies ULC, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/24/2019. (dlw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Renaud, James M. Wodarski, Michael J. McNamara, William A.Meunier, Adam S. Rizk and Marguerite McConihe - filed by ATI Technologies ULC, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Metzler, Sara)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. for ATI Technologies ULC filed by ATI Technologies ULC. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,633,506 ;7,796,133. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 03112541853.) - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., ATI Technologies ULC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. MediaTek Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediaTek USA Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediaTek Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Represented By: Adam S. Rizk
Represented By: Michael J. McNamara
Represented By: William Meunier
Represented By: Michael T. Renaud
Represented By: Marguerite McConihe
Represented By: James M. Wodarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATI Technologies ULC
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Represented By: Adam S. Rizk
Represented By: Michael J. McNamara
Represented By: William Meunier
Represented By: Michael T. Renaud
Represented By: Marguerite McConihe
Represented By: James M. Wodarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?