Smith v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jean Marie Smith
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Benderson, Heather)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings.. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/24/19. (sar)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/24/19. (sar)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Nancy Berryhill - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Jean Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Jean Marie Smith. (ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marie Smith
Represented By: Angela Pinto Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?