Foldenauer v. Edge Therapeutics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Foldenauer
Defendant: Isaac Blech, Edge Therapeutics, Inc., R. Loch MacDonald, Sol Barer, James J. Loughlin, Rosemary A. Crane, Brian Leuthner, Liam Ratcliffe and Robert Spiegel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00118
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #12 . (nmf)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brian Foldenauer as to Voluntary Dismissal (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Robert Spiegel served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Rosemary A. Crane served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Liam Ratcliffe served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. R. Loch MacDonald served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. James J. Loughlin served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Brian Leuthner served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Isaac Blech served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Sol Barer served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Foldenauer. Edge Therapeutics, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
January 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sol Barer on 1/22/2019; Isaac Blech on 1/22/2019; Rosemary A. Crane on 1/22/2019; Edge Therapeutics, Inc. on 1/22/2019; Brian Leuthner on 1/22/2019; James J. Loughlin on 1/22/2019; R. Loch MacDonald on 1/22/2019; Liam Ratcliffe on 1/22/2019; Robert Spiegel on 1/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Sol Barer, Isaac Blech, Rosemary A. Crane, Edge Therapeutics, Inc., Brian Leuthner, James J. Loughlin, R. Loch MacDonald, Liam Ratcliffe, Robert Spiegel - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2548908.) - filed by Brian Foldenauer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foldenauer v. Edge Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Blech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Loch MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Barer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary A. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Leuthner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liam Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Foldenauer
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?