Waller v. May et al
Plaintiff: Larry S. Waller
Defendant: Clifford Harris, Warden Robert May, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00231
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff's summons sent to case file. (lak)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Production of Documents directed to Warden Robert May and Clifford Harris - filed by Larry S. Waller. (lak)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Larry S. Waller. (lak)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Authorization by Larry S. Waller requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (lak)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - An initial partial filing fee of $1.44 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/3/2019.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/19. (rwc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry S. Waller (nmg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Larry S. Waller. (ddp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Production of Documents directed to Defendants filed by Larry S. Waller.(nmg)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff shall be assessed the filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of Court a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/11/2019). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/7/2019. (ceg)
February 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Jane Doe, John Doe, Clifford Harris, Robert May - filed by Larry S. Waller. (lak)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Larry S. Waller. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry S. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?