Martinelli Holdings LLC v. That's Great News, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Martinelli Holdings LLC
Defendant: That's Great News, LLC and Robert R. Roscoe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00262
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #6 . (dlw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martinelli Holdings LLC as to All Defendants Without Prejudice (Abbott, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Robert R. Roscoe, That's Great News, LLC. (lak)
February 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Astrachan for Martinelli Holdings LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Astrachan filed by Martinelli Holdings LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/15/2019. (dlw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Astrachan - filed by Martinelli Holdings LLC. (Abbott, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Robert R. Roscoe on 2/7/2019; That's Great News, LLC on 2/7/2019.(nmg) (Mailed Summons to counsel's office 2/7/2019 per counsel's request) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ddp).
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Martinelli Holdings LLC (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliates Today Media, Inc., Media Two, LLC, Captain Stormfield Group LLC, and Today Media Charitable Foundation for Martinelli Holdings LLC filed by Martinelli Holdings LLC. (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright, Trademark and Trade Dress Infringement, and Unfair Competition filed against Robert R. Roscoe, That's Great News, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2564932.) - filed by Martinelli Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinelli Holdings LLC v. That's Great News, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: That's Great News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinelli Holdings LLC
Represented By: Richard L Abbott
Represented By: James B. Astrachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?