Dynamic Energy, Inc. v. CM Energy Holdings, LP

Plaintiff: Dynamic Energy, Inc.
Defendant: CM Energy Holdings, LP
Counter Defendant: James C. Justice, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv00265
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Reply, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaim to April 19, 2019 - filed by Dynamic Energy, Inc., James C. Justice, II. (Buckley, Jennifer)
March 19, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to James C. Justice, II on 3/19/2019. (sar)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CM Energy Holdings, LP. (Powers, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Dynamic Energy, Inc., James C. Justice, II by CM Energy Holdings, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons Forms - Unsigned)(Powers, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah E. Williams and Anna G. Rotman filed by CM Energy Holdings, LP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/19. (ntl)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah E. Williams and Anna G. Rotman - filed by CM Energy Holdings, LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Powers, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to March 15, 2019 filed by CM Energy Holdings, LP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/19. (ntl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by CM Energy Holdings, LP. (Powers, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Powers on behalf of CM Energy Holdings, LP (Powers, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marcel Radomile,Richard A. Getty,Danielle A. Harlan for Dynamic Energy, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Getty, Danielle Harlan, and Marcel Radomile filed by Dynamic Energy, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/22/19. (ntl)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Getty, Danielle Harlan, and Marcel Radomile - filed by Dynamic Energy, Inc.. (Sensing, John)
February 21, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CM Energy Holdings, LP. (sar)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CM Energy Holdings, LP on 2/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bluestone Resources, Inc., Corporate Parent Bluestone Mineral, Inc. for Dynamic Energy, Inc. filed by Dynamic Energy, Inc.. (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against CM Energy Holdings, LP - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2565222.) - filed by Dynamic Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Energy, Inc. v. CM Energy Holdings, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Penberthy Buckley
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle A. Harlan
Represented By: Marcel Radomile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CM Energy Holdings, LP
Represented By: Brett M. McCartney
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: James C. Justice, II
Represented By: Jennifer Penberthy Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?