PACT XPP Schweiz AG v. Intel Corporation

Plaintiff: PACT XPP Schweiz AG
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00267
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PACT XPP Schweiz AG's First Set of Requests for Production to Intel Corporation (Nos. 1-48) filed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG.(Farnan, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ziyong Li for PACT XPP Schweiz AG added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
February 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Pushkal Mishra,Frederick A. Lorig,Mark Tung,Danielle L. Gilmore,Nima Hefazi for PACT XPP Schweiz AG added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 4/15/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2019. (nms)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick A. Lorig, Mark Tung, Danielle L. Gilmore, Ziyong Li, Pushkal Mishra and Nima Hefazi, filed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2019. (nms)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick A. Lorig, Mark Tung, Danielle L. Gilmore, Ziyong Li, Pushkal Mishra and Nima Hefazi - filed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG. (Farnan, Brian)
February 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendant to respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2019 - filed by Intel Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 14, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 3/1/2019. (dlw)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG. (Farnan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG. All Defendants. (Farnan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Intel Corporation on 2/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ddp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s)- See Attached. (ddp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Intel Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2565354.) - filed by PACT XPP Schweiz AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PACT XPP Schweiz AG v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACT XPP Schweiz AG
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ziyong Li
Represented By: Nima Hefazi
Represented By: Frederick A. Lorig
Represented By: Danielle L. Gilmore
Represented By: Pushkal Mishra
Represented By: Mark Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?