Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00318
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith A. Zullow, Emily L. Rapalino, Julius Jefferson, and Christie Larochelle, filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2019. (nms)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith A. Zullow, Emily L. Rapalino, Julius Jefferson, and Christie Larochelle - filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. answer due 4/30/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 4/30/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2019. (nms)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time, by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 4/12/2019 (nms).
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
March 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony H. Sheh for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ceg)
March 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony H. Sheh for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ddp)
March 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jingyuan Luo for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ceg)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (6 in 19-cv-321-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-318-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-312-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-314-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-310-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-316-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-313-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-320-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-347-RGA, 6 in 1:19-cv-00319-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-317-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-311-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-315-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Jessamyn S. Berniker, Stanley E. Fisher, Shaun P. Mahaffy, Anthony H. Sheh, and Jinyuan Luo, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(nms)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-UNA et al.(bkb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.: For Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.: For Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Jessamyn S. Berniker, Stanley E. Fisher, Shaun P. Mahaffy, Anthony H. Sheh, and Jingyuan Luo - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/22/2019 (nms).
February 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. on 2/14/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 2/14/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (nmg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,326,708. (nmg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/14/2010. Date of Expiration of Patent: 11/24/2026. (nmg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2569948.) - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony H. Sheh
Represented By: Jingyuan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?