Biogen International GmbH v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00333
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Bilson, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00303-UNA, 1:19-cv-00333-UNA(bkb)
February 19, 2019 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,619,001. (rwc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 1/7/19. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/20/20.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2020. (rwc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2572461.) - filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?