Alston v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Travis Alston
Defendant: Doctors For Emergency Services, Inc., Christiana Care Health System, Inc., United States of America and Westside Family Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Prothonotary, DE Superior Court from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 4/16/2019, regarding certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent. (nmg)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SO ORDERED re #10 Stipulation to Dismiss Less than All Parties and to Remand to Superior Court. Party United States of America TERMINATED. Attorney Dylan J. Steinberg terminated. All claims against Christiana Care Health Systems, Inc. and Doctors for Emergency Services, Inc. are REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/16/219. (dlw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Dismiss Less than All Parties And To Remand To Superior Court by Travis Alston. (Hudson, Bruce) Modified on 4/16/2019 (dlw).
April 16, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #11 remanding case to Superior Court. (dlw)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Complaint to 14 Days after The Motion to Dismiss is Decided. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/28/2019. (dlw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Complaint to 14 Days after The Motion to Dismiss is Decided - filed by Christiana Care Health System, Inc., Doctors For Emergency Services, Inc.. (Sabesan, Roopa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Motion to Dismiss to April 11, 2019 - filed by Travis Alston. (Hudson, Bruce)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Motion to Dismiss to April 11, 2019 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - Answering Brief due 4/12/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/5/2019. (dlw)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Substitute Party. Westside Family Health Care, Inc. terminated. United States of America substituted in place of Westside Family Health Care, Inc. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2019. (dlw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #3 MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America, Westside Family Health Care, Inc. (Steinberg, Dylan) Modified on 3/4/2019 (dlw).
March 4, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/12/2019. (dlw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Balaguer on behalf of Christiana Care Health System, Inc., Doctors For Emergency Services, Inc. (Balaguer, John)
February 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by United States of America, Westside Family Health Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steinberg, Dylan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party: The United States to replace Westside Family Health Care, Inc. - filed by United States of America, Westside Family Health Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Steinberg, Dylan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18C-11-166 CEB - (Filing Fee Waived) - filed by Westside Family Health Care, Inc., United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors For Emergency Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roopa Sabesan
Represented By: John D. Balaguer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Care Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Roopa Sabesan
Represented By: John D. Balaguer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Family Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Alston
Represented By: Bruce L. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?