Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. et al v. Cornell et al

Plaintiff: Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd. and Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.
Defendant: San Marino Business Partners, LLC, W. Bradford Cornell and Coherent Economics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00377
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2019. (Jenkins, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,Opening Brief In Support of Motion, Exhibits and [Proposed] Order filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2019. (Jenkins, David)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 Stipulation, filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. Set Briefing Schedule: re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (Answering Brief due 4/15/2019., Reply Brief due 4/29/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/2/2019. (fms)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Briefing Schedule re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , CORRECTING ENTRY:, #27 Opening Brief in Support, #26 Opening Brief in Support, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,Opening Brief In Support of Motion, Exhibits and [Proposed] Order by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Jenkins, David)
March 27, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The opening briefs attached to the motions to dismiss at D.I. Nos. #24 and #25 have been docketed separately using the BRIEF - OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT docket event. MOTIONS AND BRIEFS should be filed as two separate documents using two separate docket codes. (fms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 27 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Coherent Economics, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(fms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,Opening Brief In Support of Motion, Exhibits and [Proposed] Order filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(fms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. Text of Proposed Order)(Rogin, Alexandra) Modified on 3/27/2019 (fms).
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , and [Proposed] Order - filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Attachments: Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newell, Ryan) Modified on 3/27/2019 (fms).
March 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Norman T. Finkel, Richard M. Goldwasser, Matthew P. Tyrrell, and William R. Klein for Coherent Economics, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Shapiro for W. Bradford Cornell and San Marino Business Partners, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John M. Owen for W. Bradford Cornell and John M. Owen for San Marino Business Partners, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter M. Spingola for W. Bradford Cornell and Peter M. Spingola for San Marino Business Partners, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Owen filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC, #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter M. Spingola filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC, #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Shapiro filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/22/2019. (fms)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter M. Spingola - filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Newell, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Shapiro - filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Newell, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Owen - filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Newell, Ryan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. re #4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois, #7 Joint MOTION to Stay . (Jenkins, David)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Klein filed by Coherent Economics, LLC, #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Norman T. Finkel filed by Coherent Economics, LLC, #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew P. Tyrrell filed by Coherent Economics, LLC, #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Goldwasser filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/21/2019. (fms)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew P. Tyrrell - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Klein - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Goldwasser - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Norman T. Finkel - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Joint REPLY BRIEF re #4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois, #7 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on San Marino Business Partners LLC, Dr. W. Bradford Cornell and Coherent Economics LLC on February 13, 2019, February 13, 2019 and March 11, 2019, filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, B & C)(Jenkins, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Jenkins, David)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint to March 25, 2019 filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Coherent Economics, LLC answer due 3/25/2019; W. Bradford Cornell answer due 3/25/2019; San Marino Business Partners, LLC answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2019. (fms)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint to March 25, 2019 - filed by W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Newell, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vera M. Kachnowski for Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd. and Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois, #7 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/20/2019. (Jenkins, David)
March 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik S. Groothuis for Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to March 18, 2019 filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Coherent Economics, LLC answer due 3/18/2019; W. Bradford Cornell answer due 3/18/2019; San Marino Business Partners, LLC answer due 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/11/2019. (fms)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik S. Groothuis of Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd., #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vera M. Kachnowski of Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/8/2019. (fms)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to March 18, 2019 - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Rogin, Alexandra)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vera M. Kachnowski of Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP - filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Jenkins, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik S. Groothuis of Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP - filed by Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd., Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Jenkins, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC, W. Bradford Cornell, San Marino Business Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogin, Alexandra)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue re #4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois, #5 Opening Brief in Support, by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Lipkin, Gary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois filed by Coherent Economics, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2")(Lipkin, Gary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois - filed by Coherent Economics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement)(Lipkin, Gary)
February 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan Patrick Newell (Newell, Ryan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N19C-01-302 AML (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2577203)- filed by San Marino Business Partners, LLC, Coherent Economics, LLC, W. Bradford Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd. et al v. Cornell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Marino Business Partners, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Shaun Michael Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Robert J. Shapiro
Represented By: Peter M. Spingola
Represented By: John M. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Bradford Cornell
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Shaun Michael Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Robert J. Shapiro
Represented By: Peter M. Spingola
Represented By: John M. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coherent Economics, LLC
Represented By: Gary William Lipkin
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: William R. Klein
Represented By: Norman T. Finkel
Represented By: Richard M. Goldwasser
Represented By: Matthew P. Tyrrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verition Multi-Strategy Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Jenkins
Represented By: Vera M. Kachnowski
Represented By: Erik S. Groothuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verition Partners Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Jenkins
Represented By: Vera M. Kachnowski
Represented By: Erik S. Groothuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?