DBi Services, LLC et al v. Saghorchi et al
Plaintiff: Infrastructure Company of America and DBi Services, LLC
Defendant: Richard Thomas, Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi and Louis Berger Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00386
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney A. Michael Weber filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Richard Thomas. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/26/2019. (dlw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney A. Michael Weber - filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Green, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER re #27 Letter, #28 Letter - Having reviewed the parties letters, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on this issue on 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, prior to the hearing, the parties may conduct limited discovery regarding (1) the corporate structure and separateness of Louis Berger Services, Inc. and Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc. and (2) whether the latter entity is subject to personal jurisdiction in Delaware. On or before 6/11/2019, each side may file with the Court a letter not to exceed three pages that states (with appropriate citations) how the discovery obtained supports its position. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/23/2019. (dlw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Saghorchi's, Thomas's, and Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas.(Neinast, Lindsay)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Thomas E. Hanson, Jr. regarding Defendants' April 1, 2019 letter requesting hearing - re #27 Letter. (Hanson, Thomas)
April 1, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Jared T. Green regarding Request for Hearing. (Green, Jared)
March 29, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanson, Thomas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc.. (Green, Jared)
March 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bradley C. Tobias for Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, and Richard Thomas added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Thomas E. Hanson, Jr. regarding Subsitution of Party - re #18 Letter. (Hanson, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER re #18 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' 3/20/2019 letter #18 on or before 3/27/2019. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/25/2019. (dlw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley C. Tobias and Allison R. Brown filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Richard Thomas. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/25/2019. (dlw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley C. Tobias and Allison R. Brown - filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Bradley C. Tobias, #2 Certification of Allison R. Brown)(Green, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Neinast, Lindsay)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Neinast on behalf of All Defendants (Neinast, Lindsay)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Notice of Deposition of Basil Saghorchi and (ii) Notice of Deposition of Richard Thomas filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America.(Hanson, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from James S. Green, Sr., Esq. regarding Substitution of Defendant. (Green, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent DBi Services, LLC for Infrastructure Company of America filed by Infrastructure Company of America. (Hanson, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by DBi Services, LLC. (Hanson, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs; 2) Defendants First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiffs; 3) Notice of Deposition Directed to DBi Services, LLC; and 4) Notice of Deposition Directed to Infrastructure Company of America filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc., Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas.(Green, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanson, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from James S. Green, Sr., Esq. regarding Motion to Remand teleconference - re #11 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, James)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER re #11 Letter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' 3/18/2019 Letter #11 no later than 6:00 p.m. on 3/19/2019. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/18/2019. (dlw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Thomas E. Hanson, Jr. regarding re Motion to Remand teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Hanson, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents Directed To Defendants Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., And Louis Berger Services, Inc.; Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories Directed To Defendants Louis Berger Group, Inc., Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., And Louis Berger Services, Inc.; Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories Directed To Defendant Richard Thomas; Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents Directed To Defendant Richard Thomas; Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories Directed To Defendant Basil Saghorchi; and Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents Directed To Defendant Basil Saghorchi filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America.(Hanson, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION to Seal Document: #7 Exhibit to a Document, filed by Infrastructure Company of America, DBi Services, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/8/2019. (dlw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Document: #7 Exhibit to a Document, - filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanson, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2019. (Hanson, Thomas) Modified on 3/8/2019 (dlw).
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 [SEALED] EXHIBITS G and H to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit H to Amended Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hanson, Thomas) Modified on 3/8/2019 (dlw).
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand - filed by DBi Services, LLC, Infrastructure Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2 (Redline Amended Complaint), #9 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanson, Thomas) Modified on 3/8/2019 (dlw).
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Louis Berger Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Basil Saghorchi, Richard Thomas.(Green, James) Modified on 3/6/2019 (dlw).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Ct, Case Number 2019-0076 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2579573)- filed by Richard Thomas, Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc., Basil Saghorchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DBi Services, LLC et al v. Saghorchi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thomas
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Jared Thomas Green
Represented By: Bradley C. Tobias
Represented By: Lindsay Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Berger Hawthorne Services, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Jared Thomas Green
Represented By: Bradley C. Tobias
Represented By: Lindsay Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basil Saghorchi
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Jared Thomas Green
Represented By: Bradley C. Tobias
Represented By: Lindsay Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Berger Group, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Represented By: Bradley C. Tobias
Represented By: Lindsay Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infrastructure Company of America
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBi Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?