Gonzalez v. Verizon Wireless et al

Plaintiff: Milagros Gonzalez
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Equifax Information Solutions, LLC and Experian Information Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00387
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Judge Richard Andrews from Antranig Garibian regarding Status Letter. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER: An answer was due to be filed on 3/26/2019 (see D.I. #5 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/26/2019. (nms)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Services, Inc. filed by Experian Information Services, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Experian Information Services, Inc..(Hunter, Travis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax, by Milagros Gonzalez (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 3/29/2019 (nms).
March 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Conor M. Reardon for Experian Information Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conor M. Reardon, filed by Experian Information Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2019. (nms)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conor M. Reardon - filed by Experian Information Services, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Solutions, LLC answer due 4/25/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2019. (nms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Solutions, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Experian Information Services, Inc. answer due 4/25/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2019. (nms)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Experian Information Services, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Services, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milagros Gonzalez. Verizon Wireless served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milagros Gonzalez. Experian Information Services, Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milagros Gonzalez. Equifax Information Solutions, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Solutions, LLC on 2/27/2019; Experian Information Services, Inc. on 2/27/2019; Verizon Wireless on 2/27/2019. (Summonses mailed to Philadelphia Office).(rwc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579630.) - filed by Milagros Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Verizon Wireless et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Conor M. Reardon
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Gonzalez
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?