Faulk v. TD Bank USA, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Gwen Faulk
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00388
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement as to TD Bank USA, National Association, by Gwen Faulk (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 4/24/2019 (nms).
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax, by Gwen Faulk (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 3/29/2019 (nms).
March 29, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Settlement filed at D.I. 8 has been removed from the docket as an incorrect pdf was uploaded. (rwc) Modified on 4/1/2019 (nms).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/25/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2019. (nms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for TD Bank, USA, N.A. to move against, answer, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: TD Bank USA, National Association answer due 4/26/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2019. (nms)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for TD Bank, USA, N.A. to move against, answer, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint to April 26, 2019 - filed by TD Bank USA, National Association. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Oderah C. Nwaeze on behalf of TD Bank USA, National Association (Nwaeze, Oderah)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwen Faulk. TD Bank USA, National Association served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwen Faulk. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 2/26/2019; TD Bank USA, National Association on 2/26/2019. (Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office) (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank USA, National Association - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579675.) - filed by Gwen Faulk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulk v. TD Bank USA, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Faulk
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?