Hiwalker v. Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association et al

Plaintiff: Kelly Hiwalker
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/22/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/26/2019. (nmf)
April 23, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement (D.I. #7 ): identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association. (fms)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association.(Lydon, Tiffany)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Kelly Hiwalker (Garibian, Antranig)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/26/2019. (nmf)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 25, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 23, 2019 filed by Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association answer due 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/22/2019. (fms)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 23, 2019 - filed by Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association. (Lydon, Tiffany)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association on 2/26/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 2/26/2019. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (lak)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579745.) - filed by Kelly Hiwalker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiwalker v. Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA) National Association
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hiwalker
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?